Global Patent Index - EP 0945361 A3

EP 0945361 A3 2000-06-14 - Container of flexible material, particularly for liquid products or the like, and relative method of manufacture

Title (en)

Container of flexible material, particularly for liquid products or the like, and relative method of manufacture

Title (de)

Behälter aus biegsamen Material, insbesondere für flüssige Produkte und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Emballage en matière souple, en particulier pour des produits liquides, et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0945361 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105524 A

Priority

IT MI980659 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945361A2] A container is disclosed particularly for liquid products, such as beverages, or for doughy products and the like, consisting of a package of flexible material (2), substantially parallelepiped in shape, with vertical (5) and horizontal (6) welding and folding lines, and having respective frames (3) and (4) at its top and bottom faces, a spout (11) for dispensing the liquid being disposed at the center of the upper frame (3) and connected to the frame by means of a flexible membrane (10) which is folded towards the inside of the container during packaging, providing a housing (15) for the spout (11), and to the outside of the container during use, causing the spout (11) to protrude, the top surface of the container being covered by a peelable diaphragm (13), removal of which causes the spout (11) to protrude from the container. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/58; B65D 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/06 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01); B65D 77/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/063 (2013.01); B65D 51/185 (2013.01); B65D 77/065 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0031 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945361 A2 19990929; EP 0945361 A3 20000614; IT 1298961 B1 20000207; IT MI980659 A1 19990927

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65D 75/58 A, 7B 65D 47/06 B

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI