Global Patent Index - EP 0945388 A3

EP 0945388 A3 2000-07-26 - Method and apparatus for securing a yarn to a rotating bobbin

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for securing a yarn to a rotating bobbin

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anlegen eines Fadens an eine angetriebene Spulhülse

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour fixer un fil à une bobine en rotation

Publication

EP 0945388 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105891 A

Priority

DE 19813491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945388A2] A guide (5) places the yarn (1) that is held by the suction gun (3) into the entrainment slot of the tube (2) at a point where the direction of motion of the tube is the same as that of the yarn. Once the yarn has been trapped by the tube it is cut and the guide returns to its starting position. An Independent claim is also included for a guide (5) with a moving, spring-loaded vertical arm (12) that has a guide notch to place the yarn in the correct position near the nip between tube (2) and friction drive roller (10). The assembly is conveniently mounted on an adjustable sliding rail (20) on the traverse box (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/22 (2006.01); B65H 65/00 (2006.01); D01D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945388 A2 19990929; EP 0945388 A3 20000726; DE 19813491 A1 19991007; JP H11314846 A 19991116; US 6260784 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010127

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010321

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI