Global Patent Index - EP 0945532 A3

EP 0945532 A3 2000-08-30 - Flat clothings, especially their manufacturing for carding machines with revolving flats

Title (en)

Flat clothings, especially their manufacturing for carding machines with revolving flats

Title (de)

Deckelgarnituren, insbesondere deren Herstellung für Wanderdeckelkarden

Title (fr)

Garnitures de chapeaux, notamment leur fabrication pour machines de cardage à chapeaux mobiles

Publication

EP 0945532 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98811140 A

Priority

CH 21898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945532A2] The grinder is moved longitudinally over the surface, grinding the ends. The wires are attached to rods used in a particular carding machine defined by patent references below. References to grinding longitudinally mean moving along the length of the rod. Such grinding may not cover the full width of the wire covering. An Independent claim is included for a card covering for a carding machine, made as described. Preferred features: The assembly comprises groups of wires. Wires of only one group are ground by the longitudinally-moving grinder. Alternatively, adjacent groups are ground simultaneously during movement. After grinding, groups have different heights or areas of coverage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/24; D01G 15/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/18 (2006.01); D01G 15/24 (2006.01); D01G 15/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/18 (2013.01); D01G 15/24 (2013.01); D01G 15/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945532 A2 19990929; EP 0945532 A3 20000830

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021120

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000805

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01G 15/24 A, 7D 01G 15/38 B

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI