Global patent index - EP 0945534 A3

EP 0945534 A3 2000-11-22 - Low inertia positiv yarn furnisher for elastomeric yarns

Title (en)

Low inertia positiv yarn furnisher for elastomeric yarns

Title (de)

Trägheitsarmer Positivfournisseur für Elastomerfäden

Title (fr)

Fournisseur positif à faible inertie pour des fils élastomères

Publication

EP 0945534 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102382 A

Priority

DE 19813351 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945534A2] The tensioner (15) extends and tensions the thread to a set degree. The thread is wound a few times round the motor-driven feed wheel (16). At the feed wheel, leading tension does not influence trailing tension. The motor (17) feeds thread solely in accordance with thread demand. Its control is independent of the tensioner itself, and of tension arising in the section after the feed wheel. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding method of feed control. Preferred features: In one variant, the tensioner is a thread brake operating independently of thread speed. The sensor (24) measures tension between tensioner and feed wheel, adjusting braking accordingly. The friction brake used, has fixed or adjustable loading. An electrically controlled actuator operates it. A belt brake is employed, the controller (18) adjusting wrapping angle through an electrical actuator. Further variants, based on the foregoing principles, are described. The method provides that, following withdrawal from the supply spool, extension is such that no increase in tension causes further reversible extension.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); B65H 49/02 (2006.01); D04B 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945534 A2 19990929; EP 0945534 A3 20001122; EP 0945534 B1 20040922; BR 9901117 A 19991214; CA 2265979 A1 19990926; CA 2265979 C 20030708; CN 1154754 C 20040623; CN 1230606 A 19991006; DE 19813351 A1 19990930; ES 2224469 T3 20050301; HK 1022934 A1 20050401; ID 22332 A 19990930; IL 129084 A 20020912; IL 129084 D0 20000217; JP 3010171 B2 20000214; JP H11314840 A 19991116; KR 100292422 B1 20010601; KR 19990078236 A 19991025; RU 2150537 C1 20000610; US 6105398 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090208

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060208

2006-02-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060208

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-04-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2224469

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910553

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEINS, EBERHARD

1999-12-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMODDE, HERMANN

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI