Global patent index - EP 0945541 A3

EP 0945541 A3 2000-03-01 - Device to uniformly raise the centre and selvages of a fabric

Title (en)

Device to uniformly raise the centre and selvages of a fabric

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum gleichmässigen Rauhen der Mitte und der Kanten einer textilen Warenbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le grattage uniforme du centre et des lisières d'une étoffe textile

Publication

EP 0945541 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105385 A

Priority

IT UD980049 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945541A2] Device to uniformly raise the centre and the selvages of a fabric, the device being applied to raising machines (10) with a raising drum (16) having a plurality of raising cylinders (11) on the circumference, the raising drum (16) cooperating with an inlet drawing cylinder (17a) and an outlet drawing cylinder (17b), the device including means (13) suitable to differentiate the winding angle (a,b) of the fabric (12) onto the raising drum (16) at least between the central strip and at least a lateral strip near the selvages. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945541 A2 19990929; EP 0945541 A3 20000301; IT 1299763 B1 20000404; IT UD980049 A1 19990927; IT UD980049 D0 19980325

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030121

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT PT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI