Global Patent Index - EP 0945546 A3

EP 0945546 A3 2000-02-23 - Calender, particularly for treating a paper web

Title (en)

Calender, particularly for treating a paper web

Title (de)

Kalander, insbesondere zur Behandlung einer Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Calandre, en particulier pour le traitement d' une bande de papier

Publication

EP 0945546 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105649 A

Priority

DE 19813640 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945546A2] At least one roller (6-9) forming the double soft nip pair (19-21) is heated. Preferred features: At least one of the two nips has a heated roller. Surfaces (22) forming the nip are smooth, with a mean roughness (Ra), of up to 0.5 mu m under operational conditions. Rollers comprise a hard core (11) and resilient surface layer (10) having a predetermined, high thermal conductivity. This layer is very thin, being less than 4 mm, and especially 0.02-2 mm thick. It is a plastic, applied as a coating. One roller (7) forming the double nip has an overcoat (13) of metal, ceramic or plastic on the surface layer. All central rollers have a resilient surface and are of the same construction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00; D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945546 A2 19990929; EP 0945546 A3 20000223; EP 0945546 B1 20021106; AT 227374 T 20021115; CA 2267030 A1 19990927; CA 2267030 C 20040127; DE 19813640 A1 19990930; US 6230615 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130319

2014-01-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903283

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227374 T

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903283

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060319

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-03-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060319

2005-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903283 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227374 T 20021115

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CALENDER FOR TREATING A PAPER WEB

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21G 1/00 A, 7D 21G 1/02 B

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI