Global Patent Index - EP 0945546 B1

EP 0945546 B1 2002-11-06 - Calender for treating a paper web

Title (en)

Calender for treating a paper web

Title (de)

Kalander zur Behandlung einer Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Calandre pour le traitement d'une bande de papier

Publication

EP 0945546 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99105649 A

Priority

DE 19813640 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945546A2] At least one roller (6-9) forming the double soft nip pair (19-21) is heated. Preferred features: At least one of the two nips has a heated roller. Surfaces (22) forming the nip are smooth, with a mean roughness (Ra), of up to 0.5 mu m under operational conditions. Rollers comprise a hard core (11) and resilient surface layer (10) having a predetermined, high thermal conductivity. This layer is very thin, being less than 4 mm, and especially 0.02-2 mm thick. It is a plastic, applied as a coating. One roller (7) forming the double nip has an overcoat (13) of metal, ceramic or plastic on the surface layer. All central rollers have a resilient surface and are of the same construction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00; D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945546 A2 19990929; EP 0945546 A3 20000223; EP 0945546 B1 20021106; AT 227374 T 20021115; CA 2267030 A1 19990927; CA 2267030 C 20040127; DE 19813640 A1 19990930; US 6230615 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130319

2014-01-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903283

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227374 T

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-05-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903283

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060319

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-03-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060319

2005-03-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903283 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227374 T 20021115

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CALENDER FOR TREATING A PAPER WEB

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000210

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21G 1/00 A, 7D 21G 1/02 B

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI