Global Patent Index - EP 0945551 B1

EP 0945551 B1 2003-06-25 - Sweeping device for utility vehicle

Title (en)

Sweeping device for utility vehicle

Title (de)

Kehrvorrichtung für Arbeitsfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de balayage pour vehicule de voirie

Publication

EP 0945551 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440062 A

Priority

FR 9803940 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945551A1] The sweeping device comprises two brushes (1,2) which are vertically adjustable and mounted under the vehicle chassis. The first brush is placed at the rear of the vehicle near to a suction nozzle and the second in front of it. The rear brush is fixed in position after adjustment and the front brush is movable horizontally. The two brushes are pivoted together by a parallelogram structure (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 1/05; E01H 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/05 (2006.01); E01H 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/0845 (2013.01); E01H 1/053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945551 A1 19990929; EP 0945551 B1 20030625; DE 69908999 D1 20030731; DE 69908999 T2 20040519; FR 2776684 A1 19991001; FR 2776684 B1 20000623

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908999

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110309

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908999 P 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LAURENT CROSSET - PERROTIN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI NL

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALFRED KAERCHER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALFRED KAERCHER GMBH & CO.

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI NL

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI