Global Patent Index - EP 0945559 A3

EP 0945559 A3 2001-05-23 - Waterstop

Title (en)

Waterstop

Title (de)

Fugenband

Title (fr)

Joint de bétonnage

Publication

EP 0945559 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105963 A

Priority

DE 29805511 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945559A2] The seam strip is of elastomeric material with a middle section (10) and lateral extending wings (18) which together define an arrow head shaped cross section. The wings and the upper parts of the strip have retaining components (20) which grip into the gaps between the wings and the upper part (12) of the seam strip. Under the wing gripping area, the retaining parts are glued or vulcanised to the inner faces of the wings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/68 (2006.01); E04B 1/682 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/6806 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805511 U1 19980528; EP 0945559 A2 19990929; EP 0945559 A3 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011125

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI