Global Patent Index - EP 0945560 A3

EP 0945560 A3 2000-11-02 - Roof ventilator

Title (en)

Roof ventilator

Title (de)

Dachentlüfter

Title (fr)

Ventilateur de toit

Publication

EP 0945560 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105618 A

Priority

GB 9805974 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945560A2] A covert roof ventilator unit (10) is manufactured as a planar or substantially planar configuration, having a lower wall (13) and an upper wall (52) hingedly connected thereto which upper wall (52), when the unit (10) is in use on a roof is closed upon the lower wall (13) to form a hollow ventilator having an aperture (24) in said lower wall (13) for ventilating a roof space on which the unit (10) is used, said walls when closed together defined an elongate aperture (82) at a toe end portion of the unit (10). Baffle elements (32, 54) provided on the said walls (13, 52) intermesh in use to prevent the ingress of small birds, mammals and large insects to the roof space via the elongate aperture (82) and the aperture (24) in said lower wall (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/30; F24F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/30 (2006.01); E04D 13/17 (2006.01); F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/02 (2013.01); E04D 1/30 (2013.01); E04D 13/17 (2013.01); E04D 2001/309 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945560 A2 19990929; EP 0945560 A3 20001102; EP 0945560 B1 20040922; DE 69920309 D1 20041028; GB 2335666 A 19990929; GB 2335666 B 20000510; GB 9805974 D0 19980520

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150122 AND 20150128

2015-02-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150211

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING TECHNICAL CENTERS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING TECHNICAL CENTERS LIMITEDSUSSEX MA

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-02-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-12-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING TECHNICAL CENTERS LTD.

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-10-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920309 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031128

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-09-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI