Global Patent Index - EP 0945573 A3

EP 0945573 A3 2000-04-05 - Window, door or similar with actuating mechanism

Title (en)

Window, door or similar with actuating mechanism

Title (de)

Fenster, Tür od. dgl. mit einem Betätigungsgetriebe

Title (fr)

Fenêtre, porte ou similaire avec mécanisme d'actionnement

Publication

EP 0945573 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102446 A

Priority

DE 19812997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945573A2] The casement or leaf frame is made of wood, metal or plastic profiled sections which have a guide duct open on one side for a driving rod (4) connected to a control gear. The housing (2) contains a drive element such as pinion (3) which is supported by screw joints for example. The control handle has a polygonal pin inserted into a matching cavity. The casement or leaf frame has a passage penetrating the base of the guide duct. The housing has connections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/12; E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 9/08 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05B 9/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945573 A2 19990929; EP 0945573 A3 20000405; EP 0945573 B1 20020828; AT 222986 T 20020915; DE 19812997 A1 19990930; HU 220055 B 20011028; HU 9900695 A1 20000828; HU 9900695 D0 19990528; PL 190834 B1 20060228; PL 332179 A1 19990927; RU 2154724 C1 20000820

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-02-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Free text: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG#POSTFACH 10 05 51#57005 SIEGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SIEGENIA-AUBI KG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 1-3#57234 WILNSDORF (DE)

2003-04-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-11-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902431 20021002

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990209

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222986 T 20020915

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GERSDORF, OLIVER

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOHMANN, CORD

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAUER, LOTHAR

2001-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SASSMANNSHAUSEN, JUERGEN

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GERSDORF, OLIVER

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOHMANN, CORD

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SAUER, LOTHAR

2001-11-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SASSMANNSHAUSEN, JUERGEN

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990209

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990209

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990209