Global Patent Index - EP 0945580 A3

EP 0945580 A3 2002-09-18 - Fitting for windows or doors

Title (en)

Fitting for windows or doors

Title (de)

Beschlag für Fenster oder Türen

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour fenêtres ou portes

Publication

EP 0945580 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101031 A

Priority

  • DE 29805462 U
  • DE 19846317 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945580A2] Rails (9) are movably mounted on the edges of the frame or casement/leaf or in cavities or grooves, and are displaced by transverse pins (7) fitting into slits (8) which slope in relation to the lengthwise axis and run along the plane of the casement or leaf, or fit into a counter-groove (21) on the casement (1) or frame (2). The rails are connected by a corner-deflection at the corner of the abutting frame or casement/leaf sides. The rails are movable at right angles to the peripheral groove. The corner deflection has a housing fixed into the frame or casement/leaf and which is filled with filler material. The length of the rails with filler in the two corner deflections corresponds to the length of the rabbet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/18; E05C 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/06 (2006.01); E06B 7/10 (2006.01); E06B 7/18 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/063 (2013.01); E05C 9/24 (2013.01); E06B 7/10 (2013.01); E06B 7/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945580 A2 19990929; EP 0945580 A3 20020918; EP 0945580 B1 20051109; AT 309444 T 20051115; DE 59912748 D1 20051215; HU 220920 B1 20020629; HU 9900696 A1 19991228; HU 9900696 D0 19990528; PL 332069 A1 19990927

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI K.G.

- Effective date: 20060131

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070121

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-02-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-02-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912748 P 20051215

2005-11-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2005-11-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-06-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 19990121

- Countries: SI

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990121

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRANK, WIELAND

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GERSDORF, OLIVER

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LOHMANN, CORD

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROTGER STEIGEMANN, CARMEN

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SASSMANNSHAUSEN, JUERGEN

2001-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIMMERMANN, MICHAEL

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRANK, WIELAND

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GERSDORF, OLIVER

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LOHMANN, CORD

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROTGER STEIGEMANN, CARMEN

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SASSMANNSHAUSEN, JUERGEN

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIMMERMANN, MICHAEL

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990121