Global Patent Index - EP 0945609 A3

EP 0945609 A3 2000-08-30 - Method and apparatus for switching an inductive load

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for switching an inductive load

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schalten eines induktiven Verbrauchers

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour commuter une charge inductive

Publication

EP 0945609 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117685 A

Priority

DE 19812744 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945609A2] The load (EV1-EV4) has one connection to earth via a switch (T1-T4) and another connection to a supply voltage. The inductance has a first connection which can be connected via a second switch to earth and a second connection connected to the supply voltage. The method involves driving the switches so that when the current flow through the inductance is interrupted, released energy is used to switch the load (EV1-EV4). An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for switching at least one inductive load.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; H01F 7/18; H01H 47/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2013.01); H01F 7/1883 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2003 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2006 (2013.01); F02D 2041/201 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2079 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945609 A2 19990929; EP 0945609 A3 20000830; EP 0945609 B1 20060607; DE 19812744 A1 19990930; DE 59813582 D1 20060720; JP H11329832 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090917

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090917

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813582 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI