Global patent index - EP 0945616 A3

EP 0945616 A3 2000-04-05 - Swash plate type compressor having an improved torque transmission mechanism between a shaft and a swash plate

Title (en)

Swash plate type compressor having an improved torque transmission mechanism between a shaft and a swash plate

Title (de)

Taumelscheibenkompressor mit verbesserter Drehmomentübertragung zwischen Welle und Taumelscheibe

Title (fr)

Compresseur à plateau en biais avec une transmission de couple améliorée entre l'arbre et le plateau en biais

Publication

EP 0945616 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105502 A

Priority

JP 8121598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945616A2] In a swash plate type compressor win which a hinge mechanism (6) supporting a swash plate (5) on a shaft (4) in such a manner that the swash plate has an inclination angle variable relative to the axial direction, the hinge mechanism serves to transmit a driving torque of the shaft to the swash plate and comprises a fixed hinge (7) fixedly connected to the shaft and a movable hinge (8) fixedly connected to the swash plate. The fixed hinge has a fixed arm (72). The movable hinge has a movable arm (82) which is coupled to the fixed arm to be pivotal around an axis extending perpendicular to the axial direction. The fixed and the movable arms transmit a part of the driving torque to the swash plate in cooperation with each other. Further, the fixed hinge has an auxiliary fixed coupling portion (73). The movable hinge has an auxiliary movable coupling portion (86) engaged with the auxiliary fixed coupling portion. With this arrangement, another part of the driving torque is transmitted from the shaft to the swash plate in cooperation of the auxiliary fixed and the auxiliary movable coupling portions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/08 (2006.01); F04B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945616 A2 19990929; EP 0945616 A3 20000405; EP 0945616 B1 20031203; DE 69913228 D1 20040115; DE 69913228 T2 20041014; JP H11280645 A 19991015

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-03-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060309

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69913228

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-12-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI