Global Patent Index - EP 0945617 A3

EP 0945617 A3 2000-02-02 - Displacement control valve for use in variable displacement compressor

Title (en)

Displacement control valve for use in variable displacement compressor

Title (de)

Kontrollventil zur Kapazitätseinstellung eines Verstellkompressors

Title (fr)

Soupape de contrôle d'un compresseur à capacité variable

Publication

EP 0945617 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105008 A

Priority

JP 10036698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945617A2] For use in a variable displacement compressor having a first and a second passage which are between a crank chamber and a suction chamber and between a discharge chamber and the crank chamber, respectively, a displacement control valve is provided with a first and a second valve mechanism for adjusting opening degrees of the first and the second passages. The second valve mechanism has a valve body which is placed in the second passage and movable in a predetermined direction for opening and closing the second passage with movement thereof in the predetermined direction. The second valve mechanism is provided with a pressure canceling arrangement for making the valve body be canceled with influence of pressure of the second passage in the predetermined direction. A pressure sensing member senses pressure in the first passage. Responsive to the pressure sensed by the pressure sensing member, the first valve mechanism adjusts the opening degree of the first passage. Responsive to an operation of the first valve mechanism, the second valve mechanism adjusts the opening degree of the second passage. Responsive to an external signal, an external operation mechanism operates the first and the second valve mechanisms. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/08 (2006.01); F04B 27/14 (2006.01); F04B 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1804 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1813 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1827 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1831 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1854 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1859 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945617 A2 19990929; EP 0945617 A3 20000202; EP 0945617 B1 20011219; DE 69900614 D1 20020131; DE 69900614 T2 20020718; JP 4149558 B2 20080910; JP H11280660 A 19991015

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69900614

2016-04-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SANDEN HOLDINGS CORPORATION, LSESAKI-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANDEN CORP., ISESAKI, GUNMA, JP

- Document: DE 69900614

2016-04-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69900614

- Representative's name: PRUEFER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900614 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990905

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI