Global Patent Index - EP 0945620 A3

EP 0945620 A3 2000-08-09 - Pump with integrated power control

Title (en)

Pump with integrated power control

Title (de)

Pumpe mit integrierter Leistungsregelung

Title (fr)

Pompe avec régulation de la puissance intégrée

Publication

EP 0945620 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104516 A

Priority

DE 19812784 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945620A2] The differential pressure to be maintained by the pump is set dependent upon the temperature of the conveying medium. The control ratio between medium temperature and the differential pressure to be set, corresponds to a monotonic falling function. The medium temperature detector is integrated in the pump or the regulator module. The pump is installed in the return flow of a heating system, and the boiler is a condensing boiler, or it is used in a refrigeration regulation system. When used in a heating system, the pump automatically recognizes the night operation of the system, and automatically reduces pump output.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/08; F04D 15/00; F24D 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/06 (2006.01); F04C 14/06 (2006.01); F04C 14/08 (2006.01); F04D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/08 (2013.01); F04B 49/065 (2013.01); F04C 14/06 (2013.01); F04D 15/0066 (2013.01); F04B 2205/07 (2013.01); F04B 2205/10 (2013.01); F04C 2270/19 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0730213 A2 19960904 - BAUNACH HANS GEORG [DE]
  • [X] DE 3105373 A1 19821111 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [A] FR 2524970 A1 19831014 - ELECTRO HYDRAULIQUE SEH [FR]
  • [A] KUNZ U: "TOMORROW'S PUMP CONTROL SYSTEMS", WORLD PUMPS,GB,TRADE AND TECHNICAL PRESS LTD. MORDEN, no. 340, 1 January 1995 (1995-01-01), pages 25 - 29, XP000486932, ISSN: 0262-1762
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 088 (M - 467) 5 April 1986 (1986-04-05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945620 A2 19990929; EP 0945620 A3 20000809; EP 0945620 B1 20060628; DE 19812784 A1 19991007; DE 19812784 B4 20071031; DE 59913621 D1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-25 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20160315

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-15 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59913621

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59913621

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ HANNIG BORKOWSKI WISSGOTT, DE

2012-11-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WILO SE

2007-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GRUNDFOS MANAGEMENT A/S

- Effective date: 20070327

2007-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913621 P 20060810

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060628

2006-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILO AG

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050314

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 49/08 A, 7F 24D 19/10 B, 7F 04D 15/00 B

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI