Global Patent Index - EP 0945628 B1

EP 0945628 B1 2003-06-11 - Method and workpiece for making a sealing band for a slotted rodless cylinder

Title (en)

Method and workpiece for making a sealing band for a slotted rodless cylinder

Title (de)

Verfahren und Werkstück zur Herstellung eines Dichtungsbandes für einen geschlitzten, stangenlosen Zylinder

Title (fr)

Procédé et pièce de travail pour la fabrication d'une bande d'étanchéité pour un cylindre fendu et sans tige

Publication

EP 0945628 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99850034 A

Priority

SE 9801075 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945628A2] A method for making elongated, flexible sealing bands for inner sealing of axial slots in rodless cylinders, wherein the band includes a main portion (2,12), and extending therefrom, two sealing lips (3,13) for sealing co-operation with the cylinder in areas on each side of the slot, wherein a band workpiece (1,11) is produced from a synthetic material and fed through a cutting station, wherein the sealing lips are cut (B-B, C-C) from elements (3,8,13,14) protruding from the main portion (2). The invention is distinguished by a band workpiece (1) being produced which besides the main portion and the protruding elements includes an integral strip portion (4,14) along the longitudinal extension of the band workpiece, and that, in a cutting operation (A-A), the strip portion is longitudinally cut away from the main portion after having been used for guiding and/or feeding the band at least while cutting the sealing lips (3,13). The invention also concerns a band workpiece. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29D 99/00 (2010.01); F15B 15/08 (2006.01); F16J 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945628 A2 19990929; EP 0945628 A3 20010627; EP 0945628 B1 20030611; DE 69908687 D1 20030717; DE 69908687 T2 20040429; JP H11344118 A 19991214; SE 511691 C2 19991108; SE 9801075 D0 19980327; SE 9801075 L 19990928

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110311

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110311

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070311

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-02-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908687 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI