Global Patent Index - EP 0945676 A3

EP 0945676 A3 2000-01-05 - Burner for solid fuels

Title (en)

Burner for solid fuels

Title (de)

Brenner für feste Brennstoffe

Title (fr)

Brûleur pour combustibles solides

Publication

EP 0945676 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890060 A

Priority

AT 52198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945676A2] The fuel is fed into the container (1) from above. The burner has openings (9,15,18) for primary and secondary air to flow through. The bottom of the burner is closed by a plate (3) which has downward-pointing holes (4,5) which are closed by closure elements operated by a motor-driven opening device. A further plate (19) rests against the underside of the burner; the two plates are movable towards each other. A pin (12) introducing primary air into the burner container protrudes into a cavity in the center of the plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23B 1/30; F23J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 1/00 (2013.01); F23B 1/30 (2013.01); F23G 2209/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945676 A2 19990929; EP 0945676 A3 20000105; EP 0945676 B1 20031029; AT 406413 B8 20000725; AT 406413 B 20000525; AT A52198 A 19990915; DE 59907494 D1 20031204

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100219

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907494 P 20031204

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI