Global Patent Index - EP 0945679 B1

EP 0945679 B1 2003-06-04 - Gas burner for cooking appliances

Title (en)

Gas burner for cooking appliances

Title (de)

Gasbrenner für Kochgeräte

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz pour appareils de cuisson

Publication

EP 0945679 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400629 A

Priority

FR 9803771 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945679A1] The burner consists of a head (2) made up of a base (20) with a central feed aperture (21) for the air/gas mixture, surrounded by a skirt (22) with radial outlet slits (23). The head is covered by a cap (1) and the upper edge of the skirt has a series of projecting studs (25). The studs are narrower than the distance between adjacent slits and are spaced equidistantly between them; they are located round the inner edge of the skirt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06; F23D 14/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01); F23D 14/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/26 (2013.01); F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F23D 2212/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945679 A1 19990929; EP 0945679 B1 20030604; AT 242456 T 20030615; DE 69908468 D1 20030710; DE 69908468 T2 20040415; ES 2201641 T3 20040316; FR 2776753 A1 19991001; FR 2776753 B1 20000630; NO 310161 B1 20010528; NO 991453 A 19990927; NO 991453 D0 19990325; TR 199900646 A2 19991021; TR 199900646 A3 19991021; US 6082994 A 20000704

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170315

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170315

2018-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170315

2017-11-08 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908468

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160303

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAZ DE FRANCE, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69908468

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908468

- Representative's name: VONNEMANN, KLOIBER & KOLLEGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908468

- Representative's name: VKK PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-10-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908468

- Representative's name: VONNEMANN, KLOIBER & KOLLEGEN, DE

2011-06-29 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201641 T3

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-09-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908468 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000306

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI