Global Patent Index - EP 0945685 A3

EP 0945685 A3 2001-02-14 - Extraction hood for kitchen with recovery of thermal energy produced by cooking plates

Title (en)

Extraction hood for kitchen with recovery of thermal energy produced by cooking plates

Title (de)

Dunstabzugshaube für Küchen mit Vorrichtung zur Rückgewinnung von thermischer Energie an Kochplatten

Title (fr)

Hotte d'aspiration pour la cuisine avec récupération de l'énergie thermique produite par les plans de cuisson

Publication

EP 0945685 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99830171 A

Priority

IT RM980192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945685A2] Hot air and cooking fumes (6) from the cooker hob (7) are directed by the hood (1), optionally, sided by a fan (5), through an exhaust duct to an external discharge point. The heat exchanger typically comprises a coiled pipe (2), in the duct, connected to the top and bottom of a water tank (4), equipped with a safety valve (9) and thermometer (10). Circulation is assisted by an electric pump (3), relying on convection. A thermal sensor (8), inserted in the exchanger outlet connection, adjusts the pump speed to obtain a constant predetermined water temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945685 A2 19990929; EP 0945685 A3 20010214; IT 1299396 B1 20000316; IT RM980192 A1 19990927; IT RM980192 D0 19980325

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI