Global patent index - EP 0945700 A3

EP 0945700 A3 2000-08-23 - Device for searching land mines and the identification of such mines

Title (en)

Device for searching land mines and the identification of such mines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Minensuchen und zur Identifizierung von Minen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le recherche de mines terrestres et pour l'identification de telles mines

Publication

EP 0945700 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103749 A

Priority

DE 19813540 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945700A2] The arrangement has a carrier vehicle in the form of an endless track vehicle with leading, height-adjustable thrust arms for horizontal accommodation of a cutting roller (9) with cutting tools which is driven in opposition to the direction of travel during operation. The rotational speed of the roller is controllable to uncover objects in front of the roller for identification. Information acquired by detectors, e.g. a camera (17), is fed to a monitor for evaluation. Images can be fed to an electronic image processor for identification of foreign bodies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945700 A2 19990929; EP 0945700 A3 20000823; DE 19813540 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041126

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE SE

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI