Global Patent Index - EP 0945702 B1

EP 0945702 B1 2002-11-13 - Packaging for big calibre cartridge

Title (en)

Packaging for big calibre cartridge

Title (de)

Verpackungsbehälter für eine grosskalibrige Patrone

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'emballage pour cartouche de grand calibre

Publication

EP 0945702 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99101905 A

Priority

DE 19812633 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945702A1] The packing container (1) comprises a support tube (8) that is closed at the front, and can be closed at the rear by a cover (7). A form part (9) is fixed in the front area of the support tube, which has a central recess (11) to support the front of the cartridge (2). The recess is matched to the point part (10) of the bullet (5). An inner insert casing (12) is connected to the rear of the form part and extends to the rear of the support tube. A bracing ring (13) with radially sprung claws is fixed on its side facing the form part. The inner insert casing can slide longitudinally in the support tube between two positions. In a first position, in which the rear of the container is closed, the claws press against the outer wall of the front part (6) of the bullet, so that it frictionally abuts the claws. In a second position, the inner insert casing is slid to the rear end of the packing container, and the claws are pressed to the wall of the support tube by a guide par, to remove the frictional connection between the claws and the bullet front part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 39/00; F42B 39/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945702 A1 19990929; EP 0945702 B1 20021113; AT 227838 T 20021115; DE 19812633 A1 19990930; ES 2185256 T3 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903368

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080129

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080801

2007-01-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070109

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185256 T3

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400121

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903368 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GR IT NL SE

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227838 T 20021115

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010716

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES GR IT NL SE

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990622

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GR IT NL SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI