Global Patent Index - EP 0945766 A3

EP 0945766 A3 2000-02-23 - Black non-magnetic composite particles for black toner and black toner using the same

Title (en)

Black non-magnetic composite particles for black toner and black toner using the same

Title (de)

Schwarze nicht-magnetische zusammengesetzte Teilchen für schwarze Toner und schwarze Toner, worin sie eingesetzt werden

Title (fr)

Particules composées, non-magnétiques, noires pour révélateurs noirs et révélateurs noirs les comprenant

Publication

EP 0945766 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302317 A

Priority

JP 10013698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945766A2] Black non-magnetic composite particles for a Black toner of the present invention comprising: (a) hematite and/or iron oxide hydroxide particles having an average particle diameter of from 0.055 to 0.95 mu m; (b) a coating on the surface of said hematite and/or iron oxide hydroxide particles, comprising at least one organosilicon compound selected from: (1) organosilane compounds obtainable by drying or heat-treating alkoxysilane compounds, (2) polysiloxanes or modified polysiloxanes, and (3) fluoroalkyl organosilane compounds obtainable by drying or heat-treating fluoroalkylsilane compounds; and (c) carbon black fine particles adhered on said coating, which have a particle diameter of from 0.002 to 0.05 mu m and which are present in an amount of from 1 to 25 parts by weight per 100 parts by weight of said hematite and/or iron oxide hydroxide particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 9/09; G03G 9/097; G03G 9/083

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/083 (2006.01); G03G 9/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/0838 (2013.01); G03G 9/0839 (2013.01); G03G 9/0902 (2013.01); G03G 9/0904 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0453261 A1 19911023 - TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]
  • [A] US 5324571 A 19940628 - KOYAMA NOBORU [JP], et al
  • [A] EP 0582472 A1 19940209 - TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199020, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E05, AN 1990-152560, XP002124764
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 21 (P - 048) 7 February 1981 (1981-02-07)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945766 A2 19990929; EP 0945766 A3 20000223; EP 0945766 B1 20030514; DE 69907795 D1 20030618; DE 69907795 T2 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-03-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907795 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030514

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TODA KOGYO CORPORATION

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03G 9/09 A, 7G 03G 9/097 B, 7G 03G 9/083 B

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI