Global Patent Index - EP 0945811 A4

EP 0945811 A4 2000-12-20 - INFORMATION APPARATUS HAVING AUTOMATIC WEB READING FUNCTION

Title (en)

INFORMATION APPARATUS HAVING AUTOMATIC WEB READING FUNCTION

Title (de)

INFORMATIONSGERÄT MIT AUTOMATISCHER WEB-LESEFUNKTION

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFORMATION AVEC FONCTION DE LECTURE AUTOMATIQUE DU WEB

Publication

EP 0945811 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97909594 A

Priority

  • JP 9703830 W
  • JP 29966496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818088A1] An information apparatus which has an accessing means by which a document on the Internet is accessed and an automatic web tracingmeans which automatically browses linked sites successively according to predetermined rules and parameters based on the link information which is set in the accessed document. The predetermined rule is either depth preference search or width preference search. The predetermined parameters are at least the depth of link when lower layer sites are successively traced, the time taken by the transit from one document to the next and the time-out time of the automatic web browsing. The rule and the parameters can be variably set by a user. Both on-line automatic web browsing and off-line automatic web browsing are available. Thus, time-varying information such as television information can be automatically received while the necessary operations for the automatic web reading of the internet is minimized.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/4622 (2013.01); G06F 17/30899 (2013.01); G06F 17/30902 (2013.01); H04N 21/4782 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9818088A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818088 A1 19980430; DE 69718669 D1 20030227; DE 69718669 T2 20031127; EP 0945811 A1 19990929; EP 0945811 A4 20001220; EP 0945811 B1 20030122; JP 3098546 B2 20001016; US 6381637 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131023

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69718669

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131023

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69718669

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-12-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990521

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB