Global Patent Index - EP 0945832 A3

EP 0945832 A3 2001-03-07 - Installation for hiring transport-trolleys

Title (en)

Installation for hiring transport-trolleys

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Ausleihen von Transportwagen

Title (fr)

Installation pour la location de chariots de transport

Publication

EP 0945832 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104062 A

Priority

DE 19812496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945832A2] The apparatus has a holding device (7) with a receptacle for a readable information carrier (10). The receptacle interacts with a locking device (9), which releases a lock member (6) and arrests the information carrier in the receptacle. When the lock member is inserted into the locking device of the next trolley in line, the information carrier is released. Data from the information carrier are transmitted to a computer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06; A47F 10/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 10/04 (2006.01); G07F 7/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/0042 (2013.01); A47F 10/04 (2013.01); G07F 7/0636 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812496 A1 19990923; EP 0945832 A2 19990929; EP 0945832 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2002-01-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI