Global Patent Index - EP 0945840 A3

EP 0945840 A3 2000-09-06 - Traffic law enforcement system

Title (en)

Traffic law enforcement system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Überwachung der Verkehrsregelung

Title (fr)

Système de surveillance de la réglementation routière

Publication

EP 0945840 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105878 A

Priority

US 4727298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945840A2] A traffic law enforcement system having two or more enforcement units and at least one central computer connected via network devices. The enforcement units are spaced apart a given distance and each has a license plate reader. The central computer receives inputs from the enforcement units, including identifying indicia, such as license plate numbers of passing vehicles. The enforcement units and the central computer cooperate to calculate an average velocity of a vehicle which passes between enforcement units by using the inputs of a) minimum-travel-time-drivable distance between enforcement units which transmitted matching identifying indicia, b) posted speed limit data between enforcement units which transmitted matching license plate numbers, and c) time lapsed between the transmission of the matching identifying indicia to the central computer. After a predetermined amount of time, unmatching vehicle information is erased. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/052; G08G 1/017

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/017 (2006.01); G08G 1/052 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0175 (2013.01); G08G 1/052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945840 A2 19990929; EP 0945840 A3 20000906; EP 0945840 B1 20090603; AT 433175 T 20090615; DE 69940936 D1 20090716; ES 2328095 T3 20091106; NZ 332266 A 20001222

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 433175 T

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-04-18 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 69940936

- Effective date: 20130418

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-02-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-02-27 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-10-25 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69940936

2012-10-25 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 69940936

2012-10-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121001

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120628 AND 20120704

2012-06-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VYSIONICS ITS LIMITED

2012-06-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIPS TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

2012-06-06 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOHN B. MOETTELI

2012-05-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120510

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2012-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MOETTELI, JOHN B.

- Free text: MOETTELI, JOHN B.#UNTERTORGASSE 7#9320 ARBON (CH) -TRANSFER TO- MOETTELI, JOHN B.#UNTERTORGASSE 7#9320 ARBON (CH)

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110411

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100330

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SPEEDCHECK SERVICES LIMITED

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-04-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PIPS TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

- Effective date: 20100303

2009-11-06 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2328095 T3

2009-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOETTELI & ASSOCIES SARL

2009-07-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69940936 P 20090716

2009-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2009-06-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOETTELI, JOHN B.

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOETTELI, JOHN B.

2001-08-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOETTELI, JOHN, B.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOETTELI, JOHN, B.

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI