Global Patent Index - EP 0945848 B1

EP 0945848 B1 2002-09-25 - Drumskin for drum

Title (en)

Drumskin for drum

Title (de)

Fell für Schlaginstrument

Title (fr)

Peau pour tambour

Publication

EP 0945848 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105491 A

Priority

EP 98105491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945848A1] In a percussion instrument, parallel to a plastic sheet(s) (11), non-woven fabric(s) (10) is arranged, also held by a clamping ring (6). These layers are not adhered together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 13/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945848 A1 19990929; EP 0945848 B1 20020925; CN 1148716 C 20040505; CN 1230742 A 19991006; DE 59805687 D1 20021031; TW 415617 U 20001211; US 5962798 A 19991005

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ROLAND *MEINL MUSIKINSTRUMENTE G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030318

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030303

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021225

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805687 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI