Global Patent Index - EP 0945881 A3

EP 0945881 A3 2000-06-14 - Electrical switch

Title (en)

Electrical switch

Title (de)

Elektrischer Schalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique

Publication

EP 0945881 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101876 A

Priority

DE 19813177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813177C1] The electric switch has a pivotable switching lever (6) of at least two parts switchable between a closed position and an open position by an actuator (71). The lever is mounted with a high pressure in the closed position to reduce the contact transition resistance. The lever is held closed by a spring under tension. The spring force is supported at the bearing points (41,51) to form the electrical contact. The spring device acts between the parts (61,62) of the switching lever

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/50; H01H 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/50 (2006.01); H01H 33/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/502 (2013.01); H01H 33/127 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813177 C1 19990812; EP 0945881 A2 19990929; EP 0945881 A3 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI