Global Patent Index - EP 0945882 A3

EP 0945882 A3 2000-10-25 - Low noise relay

Title (en)

Low noise relay

Title (de)

Schallreduziertes Relais

Title (fr)

Relais à faible bruit

Publication

EP 0945882 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105690 A

Priority

DE 19813530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945882A2] The relay has an inner housing (1) where inner connectors (3) exit through an inner connector side (2). The relay also has an outer housing (4,5) with external connectors (7) passing through an external connector side (6) opposite the inner connector side (2). Flexible connection leads (8) extend between the respective side walls of the inner housing (1) and the outer housing (4,5) and connect the inner connectors with respective external connectors. An intermediate cap (10) of flexible plastic is fitted over the inner housing (1) and the connection leads (8). The plastic cap, together with the connection leads (8) separates the inner housing (1) on all sides from the outer housing (4,5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01); H01H 50/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/305 (2013.01); H01H 2009/0278 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0324439 A2 19890719 - OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]
  • [PX] EP 0838829 A2 19980429 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [DY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 334 (E - 1104) 26 August 1991 (1991-08-26)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 428 (E - 1128) 30 October 1991 (1991-10-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 593 (E - 1454) 28 October 1993 (1993-10-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 089 (E - 1323) 22 February 1993 (1993-02-22)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945882 A2 19990929; EP 0945882 A3 20001025; EP 0945882 B1 20061227; DE 19813530 A1 19991007; DE 59914083 D1 20070208; JP H11312450 A 19991109; US 6236575 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-07-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-04-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070407

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914083 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI