Global Patent Index - EP 0945918 A3

EP 0945918 A3 2000-02-02 - Electric connector

Title (en)

Electric connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0945918 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105792 A

Priority

IT TO980256 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945918A2] An electric connector (1) for connecting cables (2, 3), and which includes a connecting element (4) made of conductive sheet metal and connectable electrically to the cables (2, 3); and an enclosure (36) defined by an insulating covering (5) applied to an outer surface of the connecting element (4), and by a shielding cover (30) applied to the insulating covering (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 4/70; H01R 43/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/70 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2495 (2013.01); H01R 4/70 (2013.01); H01R 13/6599 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945918 A2 19990929; EP 0945918 A3 20000202; IT TO980256 A1 19990924

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 4/24 A, 7H 01R 4/70 B, 7H 01R 43/18 B, 7H 01R 13/658 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI