Global Patent Index - EP 0945929 A3

EP 0945929 A3 2001-12-12 - Connector for shielded cable

Title (en)

Connector for shielded cable

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für ein geschirmtes Kabel

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour un câble blindé

Publication

EP 0945929 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102760 A

Priority

DE 19811667 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945929A2] The connector holds the ends of the wires of a cable in pressure parts (8) of insulating material at an angle to the plugging direction. The wires are contacted by blade connectors in individual chambers of a carrier body which can be displaced. To connect a screened cable the pressure parts are mounted on a contact (7) and inserted into a screened housing so as to contact its walls. The cable screen is applied to the contact part. Blade connectors are mounted in insulating bodies within screened chambers (3) in the housing (1), which is connected to the contact part via a bolt (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/658

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/658 (2011.01); H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/512 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6593 (2013.01); H01R 4/242 (2013.01); H01R 13/512 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945929 A2 19990929; EP 0945929 A3 20011212; EP 0945929 B1 20030507; DE 19811667 A1 19990930; DE 19811667 C2 20020124; US 2001044231 A1 20011122; US 6347956 B2 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140222

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140222

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905397

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140222

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905397

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130307

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRIC GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: HARTING ELECTRIC GMBH & CO. KG#WILHELM-HARTING-STRASSE 1#32339 ESPELKAMP (DE) $ NOVAR GMBH#JOHANNES-MAUTHE-STRASSE 14#72458 ALBSTADT-EBINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HARTING ELECTRIC GMBH & CO. KG#WILHELM-HARTING-STRASSE 1#32339 ESPELKAMP (DE) $ NOVAR GMBH#JOHANNES-MAUTHE-STRASSE 14#72458 ALBSTADT-EBINGEN (DE)

2006-09-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1022995

2005-09-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-03-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRIC GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: ALBERT ACKERMANN GMBH & CO. KG#ALBERTSTRASSE 4-8#51643 GUMMERSBACH (DE) $ HARTING KGAA#MARIENWERDERSTRASSE 3#32339 ESPELKAMP (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HARTING ELECTRIC GMBH & CO. KG#WILHELM-HARTING-STRASSE 1#32339 ESPELKAMP (DE) $ NOVAR GMBH#JOHANNES-MAUTHE-STRASSE 14#72458 ALBSTADT-EBINGEN (DE)

2004-10-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0945929E

2003-11-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALBERT ACKERMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2003-11-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRIC GMBH & CO. KG

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905397 P 20030612

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI