Global Patent Index - EP 0945932 A3

EP 0945932 A3 2000-05-24 - Double plug connection element, adapted male and female element and related connection device

Title (en)

Double plug connection element, adapted male and female element and related connection device

Title (de)

Doppelstecker-Verbindungselement, angepasste Stecker- und Buchsenelemente sowie dazugehörige Verbindungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Elément de raccordement de deux fiches, élément male et femelle adaptés et dispositif de raccordement obtenu

Publication

EP 0945932 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99450007 A

Priority

FR 9803776 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945932A2] The connecting element has a body (18) with a first reception (24) for a connecting part formed in the body, and a contact carrier connecting block. A blind reception (34) takes in an insert (32), in which a second reception (30) is formed. A third reception (36) extends from the first recording and leads into the blind reception.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/33 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01); H01R 13/73 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H01R 27/00 (2006.01); H01R 31/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/74 (2006.01); H01R 24/64 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 23/10 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01); H01R 31/06 (2013.01); H01R 13/748 (2013.01); H01R 24/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905338 U1 19990610; EP 0945932 A2 19990929; EP 0945932 A3 20000524; FR 2776426 A1 19990924; FR 2776426 B1 20000526; JP H11329550 A 19991130; US 6146207 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT SE

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI