Global Patent Index - EP 0945963 A3

EP 0945963 A3 2002-11-27 - Motor/generator

Title (en)

Motor/generator

Title (de)

Motor/Generator

Title (fr)

Moteur/générateur

Publication

EP 0945963 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105953 A

Priority

  • JP 7744998 A
  • JP 7750898 A
  • JP 7747898 A
  • JP 16238098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945963A2] Two rotors (3,4) and one stator (2) are arranged coaxially in a three layer construction. A coil unit comprising plural coils (6) arranged at equal angular intervals on a stator (2) is provided. The coil unit forms rotating magnetic fields of identical number to the magnetic pole number of the first rotor (3) according to a first alternating current, and forms rotating magnetic fields of identical number to the magnetic pole number of the second rotor (4) according to a second alternating current. Plural rotors (3, 4) are driven by a single coil unit by supplying a composite current of the first and second alternating currents to the coil unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 16/02; H02K 11/00; H02K 21/02; H02K 51/00; H02P 6/00; H02P 6/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 11/00 (2006.01); H02K 16/02 (2006.01); H02K 21/02 (2006.01); H02K 51/00 (2006.01); H02P 6/00 (2006.01); H02P 6/08 (2006.01); B60K 1/02 (2006.01); B60K 6/26 (2007.10)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 11/048 (2013.01); H02K 11/21 (2016.01); H02K 16/02 (2013.01); H02K 21/02 (2013.01); H02K 51/00 (2013.01); H02P 6/08 (2013.01); H02P 6/28 (2016.02); B60K 1/02 (2013.01); B60K 6/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945963 A2 19990929; EP 0945963 A3 20021127; EP 0945963 B1 20031105; DE 69912504 D1 20031211; DE 69912504 T2 20040506; US 6049152 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912504 P 20031211

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19990929

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990324

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI