Global Patent Index - EP 0946164 A4

EP 0946164 A4 2000-08-23 - INTEGRIN ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

INTEGRIN ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

INTEGRIN ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DE L'INTEGRINE

Publication

EP 0946164 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97913775 A

Priority

  • GB 9626308 A
  • US 9719349 W
  • US 2922396 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818461A1] This invention relates to certain novel compounds and derivatives thereof, their synthesis, and their use as vitronectin receptor antagonists. The vitronectin receptor antagonist compounds of the present invention are alpha v beta 3 antagonists, alpha v beta 5 antagonists or dual alpha v beta 3/ alpha v beta 5 antagonists useful for inhibiting bone resorption, treating and preventing osteoporosis, and inhibiting restenosis, diabetic retinopathy, macular degeneration, angiogenesis, atherosclerosis, inflammation and tumor growth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 471/04; A61K 31/435; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/505; C07D 213/74; C07D 239/14; C07D 239/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/18 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); A61K 31/195 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/4375 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/73 (2006.01); C07D 213/74 (2006.01); C07D 239/12 (2006.01); C07D 239/14 (2006.01); C07D 239/42 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/73 (2013.01); C07D 213/74 (2013.01); C07D 239/12 (2013.01); C07D 239/14 (2013.01); C07D 239/42 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9844797 A1 19981015 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9825892 A1 19980618 - LILLY CO ELI [US], et al
  • [PA] EGBERTSON M S ET AL: "Nonpeptide GPIIB/IIIA inhibitors. 10. centrally constrained alpha-sulfonamides are potent inhibitors of platelet aggregation", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, vol. 6, no. 21, 5 November 1996 (1996-11-05), pages 2519 - 2524, XP004135906, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • See also references of WO 9818461A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818461 A1 19980507; AU 5088498 A 19980522; AU 717283 B2 20000323; EP 0946164 A1 19991006; EP 0946164 A4 20000823; JP 2001504456 A 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040301

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020528

2000-08-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 471/04 A, 7A 61K 31/435 B, 7C 07D 239/42 B, 7C 07D 213/74 B, 7C 07D 239/14 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7A 61K 31/505 B

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990531

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE