Global Patent Index - EP 0946303 B1

EP 0946303 B1 2001-04-11 - COMMINUTION MACHINE WITH AN EMULSIFIER

Title (en)

COMMINUTION MACHINE WITH AN EMULSIFIER

Title (de)

ZERKLEINERUNGSMASCHINE MIT EINEM EMULGATOR

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE REDUCTION EN MORCEAUX POURVUE D'UN EMULGATEUR

Publication

EP 0946303 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97954400 A

Priority

  • DE 29622298 U
  • EP 9707020 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6402069B1] In a comminution machine, which is particularly used in industry, with an emulsifier (3), a particularly simple structure with a single driving device for conveying, cutting and emulsifying the material to be chopped is guaranteed when, between a support body (32a) on a stator (32) of the emulsifier (3) and a fulling body (33a) on the corresponding rotor (33), there is a successively narrowing gap (36a) area in which the material to be chopped is exposed to a further constant fulling comminution under pressure. The rotor (33) is rotationally connected with the shaft (4) of the cutting and conveying device of the comminution device. On the rotor (33) a co-axial hub (33c) connected to the fulling body, is provided, with which hub the rotor (33) is fitted on the shaft (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/02 (2006.01); B02C 18/30 (2006.01); B02C 18/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/304 (2013.01); B02C 18/305 (2013.01); B02C 2018/367 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

DE 29622298 U1 19980416; BR 9713603 A 20000404; DK 0946303 T3 20010813; EP 0946303 A1 19991006; EP 0946303 B1 20010411; JP 2000513652 A 20001017; JP 3258033 B2 20020218; US 6402069 B1 20020611; WO 9828076 A1 19980702; WO 9828077 A1 19980702; WO 9828078 A1 19980702; WO 9828079 A1 19980702

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-08-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-08-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CONVENIENCE FOOD SYSTEMS WALLAU GMBH & CO. KG

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703367 20010517

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991104

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990511

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK