Global Patent Index - EP 0946311 B1

EP 0946311 B1 2000-10-25 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SHEET METAL PART BY FORMING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SHEET METAL PART BY FORMING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES BLECHFORMTEILES DURCH UMFORMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE PIECE FACONNEE EN TOLE PAR FORMAGE

Publication

EP 0946311 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97954916 A

Priority

  • DE 19653543 A
  • EP 9707029 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19653543A1] The invention relates to a method for the production of a sheet metal part (2) having various material thicknesses depending on the strength and/or stiffness requirements, by forming, preferably deep-drawing. A particularly inexpensive and, as regards the shaping process, problem-free method is possible, in accordance with the invention, when a steel sheet billet (1), as known per se, is heated in the shaping range, whereby the heating is carried out only partially or with varying intensity for the purpose of attaining a variable elongation coefficient over the whole surface of the steel sheet billet (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/00; B21D 53/88; B62D 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/20 (2006.01); B21D 22/26 (2006.01); B21D 53/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/20 (2013.01); B21D 22/26 (2013.01); C21D 1/673 (2013.01); C21D 2221/00 (2013.01); C21D 2221/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19653543 A1 19980625; EP 0946311 A1 19991006; EP 0946311 B1 20001025; ES 2151299 T3 20001216; JP 2001506543 A 20010522; US 6185977 B1 20010213; WO 9828097 A1 19980702

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151231

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111216

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111215

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111215

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151299

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702545

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-30

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000406

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990416

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB