Global Patent Index - EP 0946314 B1

EP 0946314 B1 2003-06-25 - METERING OVEN

Title (en)

METERING OVEN

Title (de)

DOSIEROFEN

Title (fr)

FOUR DE DOSAGE

Publication

EP 0946314 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951076 A

Priority

  • DE 9702663 W
  • DE 19647713 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19647713A1] The invention concerns a metering oven (1) with a vessel (12) for holding a liquid metal and with a device for detecting a liquid metal level in a vessel. A tubular probe (5) is connected to a gas source (10) for discharging a gas at a predetermined pressure from the gas source through the probe and out of its outlet aperture. The probe is spatially associated in a fixed manner with the vessel such that pressures which can be detected by a pressure-measuring device (9) can be associated with different liquid metal levels inside the probe. At a given pressure threshold value, the pressure-measuring device can emit a signal for a given liquid metal level to be detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 2/00; B22D 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/14 (2006.01); B22D 2/00 (2006.01); B22D 39/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 39/06 (2013.01); B22D 2/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19647713 A1 19980514; DE 19647713 C2 20000105; AT 243580 T 20030715; AU 5476098 A 19980603; AU 733931 B2 20010531; BR 9713002 A 20000125; CA 2271207 A1 19980522; CA 2271207 C 20060912; EP 0946314 A1 19991006; EP 0946314 B1 20030625; ES 2201336 T3 20040316; JP 2001504218 A 20010327; JP 4327908 B2 20090909; US 6303073 B1 20011016; WO 9820996 A1 19980522

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-11-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59710352

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091110

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201336 T3

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710352 P 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STRIKOWESTOFEN GMBH

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000706

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990505

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL