Global Patent Index - EP 0946318 B1

EP 0946318 B1 2001-05-23 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS THIN SLAB STEEL CASTING

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS THIN SLAB STEEL CASTING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUM STRANGGIESSEN VON DÜNNBRAMMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE COULEE CONTINUE DE BRAMES FINES

Publication

EP 0946318 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948688 A

Priority

  • DE 9702518 W
  • DE 19647702 A
  • DE 19745547 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9820998A1] The present invention pertains to a method for continuous thin slab steel casting at speeds over 3m/min. in a facility where, above an immersion spout (42) which can be closed by means of a stop element (44), the cast is fed into an ingot mould located downstream from the guide rollers of the strand. Said method comprises the following steps: a) when the slab goes out of the ingot mould, the frozen layer on each of its large sides takes a steady waved form during the plastic adaptation phase, depending on the spacing between the guide rollers on which it takes its bearing; b) thereafter, on the large sides of the slab, the shell featured by the frozen layer takes on its surface a non steady waved form during the plastic adaptation phase, depending on the arrangement of the guide rollers located opposite it; c) when the strand is removed, the transition from plastic to elastic adaptation of the frozen layer is metrologically determined and, with regard to the plastic adaptation of the shell featured by said frozen layer, the slab takes its bearing in such a way that, for a minimum force exerted upon the frozen layer, said slab is routed by the strand guiding part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/128; B22D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2006.01); B22D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/14 (2013.01); B22D 11/128 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9820998 A1 19980522; AT 201342 T 20010615; AU 7178898 A 19980603; EP 0946318 A1 19991006; EP 0946318 B1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051022

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021022

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-10-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-10-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011011

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011005

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703623 20010628

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201342 T 20010615

2000-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991015

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990430

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL