Global Patent Index - EP 0946367 B1

EP 0946367 B1 2001-01-24 - Method for inking a screen roller

Title (en)

Method for inking a screen roller

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einfärben einer Rasterwalze

Title (fr)

Procédé pour encrer un rouleau tramé

Publication

EP 0946367 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97954330 A

Priority

  • DE 9702991 W
  • DE 19653812 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9828140A1] The invention relates to a method for inking a cylinder (4) with highly viscous printing ink, in which an ink duct (1) that is open at the top is used with a doctor blade (8) that is fitted negatively on the cylinder (4). A reserve of printing ink is added to an ink duct (1), such that an inking roller (12) forms in simple manner during the functioning of the machine. A regular and intensive inking of the cylinder (4) results with only low ink circulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/02; B41F 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/027 (2013.01); Y10S 101/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9828140 A1 19980702; EP 0946367 A1 19991006; EP 0946367 B1 20010124; JP 2000516170 A 20001205; JP 3337225 B2 20021021; US 6076462 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702966 20010301

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000619

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR INKING A SCREEN ROLLER

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990715

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI