Global Patent Index - EP 0946398 B1

EP 0946398 B1 2000-08-09 - MIXING DEVICE

Title (en)

MIXING DEVICE

Title (de)

MISCHVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF MELANGEUR

Publication

EP 0946398 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97913326 A

Priority

  • GB 9703210 W
  • GB 9626804 A
  • GB 9713896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9828206A1] A containing and mixing device for a two constituent product, comprising a flexible container (1) for a first constituent, a vessel (6) for containing a second constituent, the vessel being mounted to the container and a breakable membrane (5) between the vessel and container, wherein the flexible container and membrane are arranged such that the membrane is breakable through finger pressure applied through the flexible container, so as to allow the constituent parts to be mixed within the flexible container and subsequently dispensed through the vessel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9828206 A1 19980702; AU 5062598 A 19980717; AU 723172 B2 20000817; DE 69702773 D1 20000914; DE 69702773 T2 20010329; EP 0946398 A1 19991006; EP 0946398 B1 20000809

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051124

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021125

2001-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-06 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20011106

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE EST

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702773 20000914

2000-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-08-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IE IT LI NL

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990428

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IE IT LI NL