Global patent index - EP 0946464 A4

EP 0946464 A4 2000-12-06 - AMMONIUM NITRATE PROPELLANTS WITH MOLECULAR SIEVE

Title (en)

AMMONIUM NITRATE PROPELLANTS WITH MOLECULAR SIEVE

Title (de)

MOLEKULARSIEB UND AMMONIUMNITRAT ENTHALTENDE TREIBSTOFFE

Title (fr)

PROPULSEURS AU NITRATE D'AMMONIUM A TAMIS MOLECULAIRE

Publication

EP 0946464 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96946254 A

Priority

US 9618874 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9823558A1] The present invention is directed to an age-stabilized and/or strengthened ammonium nitrate propellant composition wherein the strengthening agent is selected from the group consisting of azodicarbonamide, dicyandiamide, oxamide and mixtures thereof and wherein the age-stabilizing agent is a molecular sieve having a pore size of 13 angstroms or less.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 31/28; C01C 1/18; C06B 31/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06B 23/00 (2006.01); C06B 31/28 (2006.01); C06B 31/30 (2006.01); C06B 31/32 (2006.01); C06B 45/10 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 31/30 (2013.01); C06B 23/006 (2013.01); C06B 45/105 (2013.01); C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9504710 A1 19950216 - AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]
  • [DY] US 5271778 A 19931221 - BRADFORD DANIEL J [US], et al
  • [DY] US 5292387 A 19940308 - HIGHSMITH THOMAS K [US], et al
  • [DY] US 4158583 A 19790619 - FROSCH ROBERT A ADMINISTRATOR, et al
  • [A] US 4486396 A 19841204 - KJOHL OLAV [NO], et al
  • [A] US 2730814 A 19560117 - THOMAS GIACHINO MARCELLO
  • [XY] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 24, 15 December 1986, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 211170e, N.F. VOVKOTRUB ET AL.: "Modifying the transformation of ammonium nitrate conditioned by mineral additives" page 129; XP002140233 & KHIM. TEKHNOL. (KIEV), vol. 5, 1986, pages 13 - 18KHIM. TEKHNOL. (KIEV)198651318
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199709, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class C04, AN 1997-087892, XP002140235
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 19, 12 May 1986, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 167554m, G.V. TSITSISHVILI ET AL.: "Use of natural zeolites as anticaking additives of mineral fertilizers" page 592; XP002140234 & SOOBSHCH. AKAD. NAUK. GRUZ. SSR, vol. 120, no. 3, 1985, pages 537 - 540SOOBSHCH. AKAD. NAUK. GRUZ. SSR19851203537540
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199426, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class K04, AN 1994-216292, XP002140236
  • See also references of WO 9823558A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9823558 A1 19980604; CA 2273335 A1 19980604; EP 0946464 A1 19991006; EP 0946464 A4 20001206; JP 2002511829 A 20020416; KR 20000057253 A 20000915

INPADOC legal status

2012-01-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110621

2007-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOODRICH CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020903

2000-12-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 06B 31/28 A, 7C 01C 1/18 B, 7C 06B 31/30 B

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990625

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE