Global Patent Index - EP 0946689 A4

EP 0946689 A4 2000-11-22 - ANTIOXIDANTS AND ANTIOXIDANT BOOSTERS CAPABLE OF PRODUCING HYDROPEROXYL RADICALS

Title (en)

ANTIOXIDANTS AND ANTIOXIDANT BOOSTERS CAPABLE OF PRODUCING HYDROPEROXYL RADICALS

Title (de)

ANTIOXIDANTIEN UND ANTIOXIDANTIONSVERSTÄRKER ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON HYDROPEROXIDRADIKALEN FÄHIGE

Title (fr)

ANTI-OXYDANTS ET RENFOR ATEURS D'ANTI-OXYDANTS CAPABLES DE PRODUIRE DES RADICAUX D'HYDROPEROXYLE

Publication

EP 0946689 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97941625 A

Priority

  • US 9716332 W
  • US 71342096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811181A1] An antioxydant which comprises a primary aliphatic hydroxyl group linked to an organic backbone such that upon oxidation a hydroperoxyl moiety capable of boosting the efficacy of free radical scavengers and hydroperoxide decomposer type antioxidants is generated in situ. The antioxidant is preferably: (a) a high hydroxyl polyol ester having between about 1-35 % unconverted hydroxyl groups; (b) the reaction product of polyol and at least one acid selected from the group consisting of: phenolic acids, aromatic amine acids, phosphoric acids, and sulfuric acids; (c) the reaction product of (b) wherein the unconverted hydroxyl group is reacted with a facile leaving group, thereby producing free -CH2OH groups upon hydrolysis or oxidation; and (d) the antioxidant of (a), (b) or (c) blended with or grafted onto at least one material selected from the groups consisting of: mineral oils, polyol esters, polyalpha olefins, fuels, oligomers and polymers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 105/40; C09K 15/06; C09K 15/22; C09K 15/30; C09K 15/32; C10M 129/26; C10M 129/76; C10M 133/16; C10M 133/48; C10M 159/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 15/20 (2006.01); C07C 233/18 (2006.01); C07D 263/14 (2006.01); C07D 263/52 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01); C09K 15/30 (2006.01); C10M 105/32 (2006.01); C10M 129/76 (2006.01); C10M 133/08 (2006.01); C10M 133/16 (2006.01); C10M 133/48 (2006.01); C10M 159/12 (2006.01); C10M 159/18 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 263/52 (2013.01); C07C 233/18 (2013.01); C07D 263/14 (2013.01); C10M 105/32 (2013.01); C10M 129/76 (2013.01); C10M 133/16 (2013.01); C10M 133/48 (2013.01); C10M 159/12 (2013.01); C10M 159/18 (2013.01); C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 2205/02 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0206 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2805 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2875 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2885 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2895 (2013.01); C10M 2207/345 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/227 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2227/09 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/03 (2013.01); C10N 2210/04 (2013.01); C10N 2210/08 (2013.01); C10N 2230/08 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/105 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01); C10N 2240/121 (2013.01); C10N 2240/14 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/401 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811181 A1 19980319; AU 4349497 A 19980402; BR 9711779 A 19990824; CA 2264553 A1 19980319; CN 1230211 A 19990929; EP 0946689 A1 19991006; EP 0946689 A4 20001122; JP 2002501552 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030213

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

2000-11-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10M 105/40 A, 7C 10M 129/76 B, 7C 10M 133/16 B, 7C 10M 133/48 B, 7C 10M 129/26 B, 7C 10M 159/12 B, 7C 09K 15/06 B, 7C 09K 15/22 B, 7C 09K 15/30 B, 7C 09K 15/32 B, 7C 10M 159/12 J, 7C 10M 129:24 J, 7C 10M 129:28 J, 7C 10M 129:48 J, 7C 10M 133:08 J, 7C 10N 10/02 K, 7C 10N 10:06 K, 7C 10N 10:08 K, 7C 10N 10:16 K

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990401

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL