Global Patent Index - EP 0946691 B1

EP 0946691 B1 2001-01-10 - LUBRICANT WITH PHOSPHOLIPID AND A BASIC COMPOUND BASE

Title (en)

LUBRICANT WITH PHOSPHOLIPID AND A BASIC COMPOUND BASE

Title (de)

SCHMIERMITTEL MIT PHOSPHOLIPID UND EINE BASISCHE KOMPONENTE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

LUBRIFIANT A BASE DE PHOSPHOLIPIDE ET D'UN COMPOSE BASIQUE

Publication

EP 0946691 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96932396 A

Priority

BE 9600105 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814538A1] The invention concerns a lubricating composition, in particular for swaging, consisting of a suspension in water of a mixture of phospholipids and an organic or mineral basic compound. For example, the composition contains 80 wt.% water, 10 wt.% phospholipids brought in the form of soja bean lecithin, and 10 wt.% of calcium hydroxide or stearylamine as basic compound. Among other advantages the lubricant can be eliminated by means of an aqueous solvent, and is easily biodegradable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/062 (2013.01); C10M 2201/063 (2013.01); C10M 2201/08 (2013.01); C10M 2201/081 (2013.01); C10M 2201/082 (2013.01); C10M 2201/084 (2013.01); C10M 2201/085 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/043 (2013.01); C10M 2223/10 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/40 (2013.01); C10N 2240/402 (2013.01); C10N 2240/403 (2013.01); C10N 2240/404 (2013.01); C10N 2240/405 (2013.01); C10N 2240/406 (2013.01); C10N 2240/407 (2013.01); C10N 2240/408 (2013.01); C10N 2240/409 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 173/02 + C10M 125/10 + C10M 133/06 + C10M 137/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814538 A1 19980409; AU 7122396 A 19980424; DE 69611553 D1 20010215; DE 69611553 T2 20010823; EP 0946691 A1 19991006; EP 0946691 B1 20010110; ES 2155203 T3 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031004

2005-10-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051003

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031003

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031004

2003-10-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031004

2003-10-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031003

2002-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021014

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021007

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155203 T3

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: IPSER S.R.L.

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611553 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991012

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990503

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE