Global patent index - EP 0946775 B1

EP 0946775 B1 2000-11-22 - IRON BASED METAL POWDER MIXTURE AND COMPONENT MADE THEREFROM

Title (en)

IRON BASED METAL POWDER MIXTURE AND COMPONENT MADE THEREFROM

Title (de)

METALLPULVERMISCHUNG AUF EISENBASIS UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTES BAUTEIL

Title (fr)

MELANGE METALLIQUE PULVERULENT A BASE DE FER ET ELEMENT REALISE AVEC CE MELANGE

Publication

EP 0946775 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97939050 A

Priority

  • GB 9702396 W
  • GB 9621232 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2318126A] A powder mixture suitable for use in a compaction and sintering process comprises three constituents. The first constituent is substantially carbon-free and is formed by one or more alloyed powders and has a composition lying in the range expressed in % by weight: 8 to 12 chromium, 0.5 to 3 molybdenum, optionally up to a total of 10 of at least one metal selected from vanadium, cobalt and tungsten, a maximum of 2 of other materials including impurities, and the balance iron. The second constituent is formed by sufficient carbon powder to bring the total carbon content of the mixture to 1.5 to 3.0% by weight. The third constituent is formed by sufficient ferrophosphorus powder to bring the total phosphorus content of the mixture to 0.1 to 0.5% by weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 33/02 (2006.01); F01L 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/16 (2013.01); C22C 33/0214 (2013.01); C22C 33/0285 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2318126 A 19980415; GB 2318126 B 20000920; GB 9718854 D0 19971112; DE 69703589 D1 20001228; DE 69703589 T2 20010621; EP 0946775 A1 19991006; EP 0946775 B1 20001122; ES 2152106 T3 20010116; GB 9621232 D0 19961127; KR 20000048952 A 20000725; WO 9816666 A1 19980423

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090916

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100908

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69703589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100908

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090807

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030910

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-09-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030909

2002-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152106

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-28

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL SINTERED PRODUCTS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991102

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990406

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE