Global Patent Index - EP 0946785 B1

EP 0946785 B1 2002-09-18 - A PROCESS FOR TREATING ARAMID SURFACES TO BE PLATED

Title (en)

A PROCESS FOR TREATING ARAMID SURFACES TO BE PLATED

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZU BESCHICHTENDEN ARAMIDOBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR TRAITER DES SURFACES EN ARAMIDE DESTINEES A ETRE PLAQUEES

Publication

EP 0946785 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97952537 A

Priority

  • US 9723445 W
  • US 76902496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9827248A1] A process is disclosed for preparing an aramid surface to be metal plated by nonaqueous treatment with a strong base followed by water washing - all in the absence of metal cations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 18/00 (2006.01); C23C 18/20 (2006.01); D06M 11/83 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 11/83 (2013.01); C23C 18/206 (2013.01); C23C 18/2066 (2013.01); D06M 2101/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9827248 A1 19980625; AU 5612298 A 19980715; AU 723863 B2 20000907; BR 9714221 A 20000418; DE 69715662 D1 20021024; DE 69715662 T2 20030515; EP 0946785 A1 19991006; EP 0946785 B1 20020918; JP 2001506699 A 20010522; JP 4114724 B2 20080709; KR 100498949 B1 20050704; KR 20000057638 A 20000925; TW 357119 B 19990501; US 5773089 A 19980630

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171215

2018-01-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171215

2017-12-20 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20171215

2017-12-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715662

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MICRO-COAX, INC.

- Effective date: 20080730

2006-05-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715662 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010514

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL