Global Patent Index - EP 0946789 B1

EP 0946789 B1 2001-03-21 - PROCESS FOR CARRYING OUT CHEMICAL REACTIONS IN AN ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR CARRYING OUT CHEMICAL REACTIONS IN AN ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM DURCHFÜHREN VON CHEMISCHEN REAKTIONEN IN EINER ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN ZELLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE DES REACTIONS DANS UNE CELLULE ELECTROCHIMIQUE

Publication

EP 0946789 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951949 A

Priority

  • DE 19649832 A
  • EP 9706538 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19649832A1] This invention concerns a process in which gases or gas mixtures are reacted in the presence of an ion-conductive liquid in an electro-chemical cell. The cell has at least one anode (2) and at least one cathode (3) to which an external electrical constant potential is applied so that a direct current flows through the ion-conducting liquid. In the lower region of the cell a sump (4) of ion-conductive liquid is located into which the electrodes are partially immersed. At least 20 % of the entire surface of at least one of the electrodes is located outside the sump in an upper region through which gas flows. This upper region of the cell is sprayed or irrigated with the ion-conductive liquid and the electrode surface at least partially wet. During this wetting process, the gas flows across the electrode surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 1/00; C25B 9/00; C25B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 1/00 (2006.01); C25B 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 1/00 (2013.01); C25B 15/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649832 A1 19980604; AU 5554998 A 19980629; AU 717326 B2 20000323; BR 9714368 A 20001017; EP 0946789 A1 19991006; EP 0946789 B1 20010321; ES 2155708 T3 20010516; US 6238547 B1 20010529; WO 9824949 A1 19980611

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121122

2014-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140305

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59703201

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011121

2002-07-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155708

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703201

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000831

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE