Global Patent Index - EP 0946803 B1

EP 0946803 B1 2001-03-28 - DEVICE FOR KNOTTING PEARL NECKLACES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR KNOTTING PEARL NECKLACES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM KNOTEN VON PERLENKETTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR REALISER DES NOEUDS SUR DES COLLIERS DE PERLES

Publication

EP 0946803 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97953817 A

Priority

  • DE 29621634 U
  • EP 9707028 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9826121A1] The device for knotting pearl necklaces has a first holder (16) for a pearl (35) mounted on a thread (36) and secured by a knot, wherein the holder (16) has a slit which is opened on one side to enable lateral insertion of the thread (36). Said device has also a loop-forming device (11) comprising a first finger (12) which is mounted at a distance from the first holder (16), and a catching device (13) which can be pivoted around an axis (9) located closer to the finger (12) than to the catching device (13). The pivoting angle is such that when the catching device (13) pivots, a first section (36b) of the thread (36) taken up thereby passes in front of a second section (36a) of the thread (36) extending between the first holder (16) and the finger (12). The inventive device further includes a loop holder (19) in the form of a second finger extending perpendicular to the pivoting plane of the catching device (13). The loop holder can be moved back and forth from a first rest position and a second operating position. In its operating position, said holder engages in the intermediate area between a second (36a) and a first (36b) section of the thread which passes in front of the second section (36a) keeping open the loops formed by the pivoting catching device (13). The holder can also be moved perpendicular to its longitudinal direction. Also provided in the inventive device is a passage (42) traversing the pivotal plane in the pivoting area of the catching device (13), by means of which the open end of the thread (36) can be introduced. Further, a second holder (28) is provided with a second slit located approximately at the same level as the first slit and comprising an opening on one side close to the one-sided opening of the first slit, wherein a misalignment between both holders (16, 28) is provided and is adjusted according to the mobility of the second finger (19) so that the second finger (19) when seen from the position of the pearl to be knotted (35), can be shifted from a position behind the first holder (16) into a position in front of the second holder (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04G 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04G 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9826121 A1 19980618; AT 200113 T 20010415; DE 29621634 U1 19980903; EP 0946803 A1 19991006; EP 0946803 B1 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011215

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: JOSEF EBERLE GMBH + CO. KG. EN MANDERLA, GUENTER

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703257 20010503

2001-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JOSEF EBERLE GMBH + CO. KG.

2001-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MANDERLA, GUENTER

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2001-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200113 T 20010415

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000712

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990710

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB IT LI NL