Global Patent Index - EP 0946824 B1

EP 0946824 B1 2001-04-11 - HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT FOR A HYDRAULIC EXCAVATOR

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT FOR A HYDRAULIC EXCAVATOR

Title (de)

HYDRAULIKSCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN HYDRAULIKBAGGER

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT HYDRAULIQUE POUR PELLE HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 0946824 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97946749 A

Priority

  • DE 19652922 A
  • EP 9705792 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19652922A1] The invention concerns a hydraulic circuit for a hydraulic excavator with a motorized drive which acts upon at least two closed drive circuits which each comprise a hydraulic pump and a hydraulic motor, are connected in parallel and operate on a common output, connection lines being provided between the hydraulic pump and the hydraulic motor of each drive circuit. The object of the invention is to improve this hydraulic circuit such that, if damage is incurred, the components involved in different operating modes are largely prevented from contaminating one another with particles and any damage caused can be determined more easily. To that end, the connection lines (L11, L12; L21, L22) of each drive circuit (A1, A2) are disposed only between the hydraulic pump (P1, P2) and the hydraulic motor (HM1, HM2) of the respective drive circuit (A1, A2), such that there is no hydraulic connection between the different drive circuits (A1, A2), a separate control valve (S1, S2) being connected to each of the respective drive circuits (A1, A2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/12 (2006.01); F15B 11/17 (2006.01); F15B 21/04 (2006.01); F16H 61/40 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/2292 (2013.01); E02F 9/123 (2013.01); E02F 9/128 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01); F15B 11/17 (2013.01); F15B 21/041 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20576 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30585 (2013.01); F15B 2211/329 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7058 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7107 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7142 (2013.01); F15B 2211/715 (2013.01); F15B 2211/763 (2013.01); F15B 2211/78 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19652922 A1 19980625; DE 19652922 C2 19990729; EP 0946824 A1 19991006; EP 0946824 B1 20010411; JP 2001506349 A 20010515; US 6996979 B1 20060214; WO 9827287 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141021

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141021

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-01-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-10-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-10-18 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2002-10-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-10-18 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991228

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990325

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB