Global Patent Index - EP 0946848 B1

EP 0946848 B1 2001-12-19 - OPERATING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR A SHAFT FURNACE

Title (en)

OPERATING METHOD AND DEVICE FOR A SHAFT FURNACE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES SCHACHTOFENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN FOUR A CUVE

Publication

EP 0946848 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948806 A

Priority

  • DE 19646802 A
  • EP 9705906 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19646802A1] An operating method for a cupola melting furnace. Metal charging stock, alloying elements and energy carrying substances such as coke are added in the upper part (1) of the shaft. An oxidyzing medium such as air is added in the lower part (2) of the shaft. Additives such as alloying elements, metal chips, carbon, sand and dust of different types are introduced either individually or in combination into the melting section (5) in at least one first jet. Combustibles can also be charged into the first jet, possibly together with oxygen. Said method is characterized in that oxygen is introduced into the melting section at high speed in at least one separate second jet and the conditions in which the above-mentioned substances are charged into the first jet and oxygen is charged into a second jet are controlled in such a way as to prevent a flame from being formed. The method enables flexible adaptation to changing operating conditions at guaranteed optimal molten mass quality and environmentally friendly operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 1/16; C21B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 5/02 (2006.01); F27B 1/16 (2006.01); F27B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 1/20 (2013.01); C21B 5/023 (2013.01); F27B 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19646802 A1 19980514; AT 211250 T 20020115; AU 7180698 A 19980603; EP 0946848 A2 19991006; EP 0946848 B1 20011219; ES 2170421 T3 20020801; TW 365644 B 19990801; US 6187258 B1 20010213; WO 9821536 A2 19980522; WO 9821536 A3 19981029; ZA 9709426 B 19980512

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705923

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151025

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151025

2016-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 211250 T

- Effective date: 20151025

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141013

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071003

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Effective date: 20071003

2007-12-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-01-23 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-11-21 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MESSER GRIESHEIM G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-12-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2002-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH,FRANKFURT AIRPORT CENTER 1, C9, HUGO-ECKENER-RING,60547 FRANKFURT (DE) -DANN IN- MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH,FRITZ-KLATTE-STRASSE 6,65933 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170421 T3

2002-06-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705923 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211250 T 20020115

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000503

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990614

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE