Global Patent Index - EP 0946904 B1

EP 0946904 B1 2000-08-30 - METHOD FOR ADJUSTING THE DEVELOPMENT PROCESS IN AN ELECTROGRAPHIC PRINTER OR COPIER, AND THE DEVELOPPING APPARATUS REQUIRED FOR THE APPLICATION OF SAME

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ADJUSTING THE DEVELOPMENT PROCESS IN AN ELECTROGRAPHIC PRINTER OR COPIER, AND THE DEVELOPPING APPARATUS REQUIRED FOR THE APPLICATION OF SAME

Title (de)

REGELUNG DES ENTWICKLUNGSPROZESSES EINES ELEKTROGRAFISCHEN DRUCKERS ODER KOPIERERS SOWIE EINE ENTWICKLUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EINE SOLCHE REGELUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGLAGE D'UNE IMPRIMANTE OU D'UN PHOTOCOPIEUR ELECTROGRAPHIQUE, ET APPAREIL DE DEVELOPPEMENT REQUIS POUR SON APPLICATION

Publication

EP 0946904 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97952744 A

Priority

  • DE 9702977 W
  • DE 19652851 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9827470A1] Disclosed is a method for operating an electrographic printer or copier, as well as a developping apparatus, wherein a layer (26) containing toner particles is deposited on a toner receiving surface (24) by means of a force field. The actual amount of toner per surface section is detected on at least one point of the layer (26). The force field is then modified in a regulator circuit (58, 50, 70, 22) according to the deviation of the actual amount of toner from a predetermined set amount of toner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08; G03G 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/06 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0808 (2013.01); G03G 15/081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9827470 A1 19980625; EP 0946904 A1 19991006; EP 0946904 B1 20000830; JP 2001506374 A 20010515; US 6175697 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702298 20001005

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991027

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990715

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB